+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0425
- Effective Date August 16, 2011
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 10, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000
On April 27, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On April 26, 2011 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
- Second Reading
On March 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2011
- Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William Delgado
+ − Statute Amended
- 705 ILCS 405/2-28 - from Ch. 37, par. 802-28
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2011: SB1949 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 19, 2011
April 14, 2011: SB1949 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 14, 2011
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor