+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (78)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0912
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date December 19, 2016
- Sent to the Governor
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 5 - December 1, 2016
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Withdrawn by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-002-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William R. Haine
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 5
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments
- 3/5 Vote Required
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 047-006-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Senate Concurs 047-006-000
- Senate Concurs
- Passed Both Houses
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-010-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-005-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 020-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 4, 2015
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 021-000-000
- Remains in Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 043-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
House Amendment 005
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that additional benefits shall be available for specified time periods to an otherwise eligible individual: who was certified as eligible to apply for adjustment assistance under the federal Trade Act of 1974, on or after January 1, 2015, who has not received the maximum amount of trade readjustment allowances payable to him or her pursuant to specified provisions of the federal Trade Act of 1974, as a result of the certification, and whose total or partial unemployment is attributable to a layoff from a steel manufacturer. Also provides that an individual shall be eligible to receive additional benefits for a week if he or she: has met specified requirements of the Unemployment Insurance Act; is an exhaustee; and except when the result would be inconsistent with the new provisions, has satisfied the requirements of this Act for the receipt of regular benefits. Contains provisions regarding: status as an exhaustee; applicability; examination of claims; interpretation; and other matters. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Workers' Occupational Diseases Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission.
Senate Amendment 001
Provides for determinations regarding whether a self-inflicted injury is connected to active duty to the made by a medical, rather than mental health, professional.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 820 ILCS 315/2 - from Ch. 48, par. 282
- 820 ILCS 315/2 -
- 820 ILCS 310/13 - from Ch. 48, par. 172.48
- 820 ILCS 405/408.5 new -