+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (74)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0181
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 2, 2019
- Sent to the Governor
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3, 4 - May 31, 2019
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2, 3, 4
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Steve McClure
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William E. Brady
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 4 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Andy Manar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jonathan Carroll
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-000-000
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2019
- Do Pass as Amended State Government; 005-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
- Postponed - State Government
- Assigned to State Government
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
+ − Adopted Amendments (5)
House Amendment 004
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates the Property Tax Relief Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall identify the causes of increasingly burdensome property taxes across Illinois, review best practices in public policy strategies that create short-term and long-term property tax relief for homeowners, and make recommendations to assist in the development of short-term and long-term administrative, electoral, and legislative changes needed to create short-term and long-term property tax relief for homeowners. Provides for the membership of the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall submit its initial report to the Governor and the General Assembly within 90 days of the effective date of this amendatory Act, and provides that the Task Force shall submit its final report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2019. Repeals these provisions December 31, 2020. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates the Property Tax Relief Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall identify the causes of increasingly burdensome property taxes across Illinois, review best practices in public policy strategies that create short-term and long-term property tax relief for homeowners, and make recommendations to assist in the development of short-term and long-term administrative, electoral, and legislative changes needed to create short-term and long-term property tax relief for homeowners. Provides for the membership of the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall submit its initial report to the Governor and the General Assembly within 90 days of the effective date of this amendatory Act, and provides that the Task Force shall submit its final report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2019. Repeals these provisions December 31, 2020. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates the Property Tax Relief Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall identify the causes of increasingly burdensome property taxes across Illinois, review best practices in public policy strategies that create short-term and long-term property tax relief for homeowners, and make recommendations to assist in the development of short-term and long-term administrative, electoral, and legislative changes needed to create short-term and long-term property tax relief for homeowners. Provides for the membership of the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall submit its initial report to the Governor and the General Assembly within 90 days of the effective date of this amendatory Act, and provides that the Task Force shall submit its final report to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31, 2019. Repeals these provisions December 31, 2020. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the State Treasurer Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning bond.
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the State Treasurer is authorized to acquire (currently, purchase) real property located in Springfield, Illinois. Provides that real property acquired by the State Treasurer under specified provisions may be acquired subject to any third party interests in the property that do not prevent the State Treasurer from exercising the intended beneficial use of such property. Removes provisions concerning the form in which property may be acquired by the State Treasurer. Removes provisions concerning a leaseback of property. Modifies the term "operational expenses of the Office of the State Treasurer".
+ − Proposed Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 15 ILCS 505/35 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.12 - from Ch. 127, par. 144.12
- 15 ILCS 505/1 - from Ch. 130, par. 1
- 35 ILCS 200/24-36 new -