+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0577
- Effective Date January 1, 2014
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 046-008-001
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Michael Connelly
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Transportation; 010-002-001
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Transportation
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 20, 2013
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 17, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-001
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
- Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 016-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2013
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Provides that persons with disability decals shall not be exempt from the payment of fees in publicly owned parking structures.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code provisions on special decals for parking for persons with disabilities. Provides that for a meter-exempt parking decal the medical condition must be permanent rather than for an estimated duration.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 625 ILCS 5/11-1301.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-1301.1
- 625 ILCS 5/11-1301.2 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-1301.2
- 625 ILCS 5/11-1301.1 -
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2013: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, May 30, 2013
May 17, 2013: SB1929 - Third Reading - Friday, May 17, 2013
April 17, 2013: SB1929 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 17, 2013
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor