+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0370
- Effective Date August 13, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
- Arrived in House
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 015-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill, but further amends the Southern Illinois University Management Act to add the Dean of the College of Agricultural, Life, and Physical Sciences, Southern Illinois University at Carbondale, as a member of the Illinois Ethanol Research Advisory Board. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 110 ILCS 520/2 - from Ch. 144, par. 652
- 110 ILCS 520/6.6 -