+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0224
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 18, 2003
On June 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Vince Demuzio
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Adopted Executive; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 053-002-000
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01 - May 31, 2003
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
On May 30, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-009-009
On May 29, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 27, 2003 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On May 23, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 31, 2003
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-016-002
- Verified
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 18, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 008-005-000
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Vince Demuzio
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces the title and everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Health Care Worker Background Check Act. Prohibits a health care employer from hiring, after January 1, 2004, an individual in a position with duties involving direct care of clients, patients, or residents who has (i) been convicted of committing or attempting to commit specified offenses in the Criminal Code of 1961, the Illinois Credit Card and Debit Card Act, or the Wrongs to Children Act or (ii) violated a specified provision of the Nursing and Advanced Practice Nursing Act. Makes changes to the duties of the Health Care Worker Task Force and who shall serve on the Task Force. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2003: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Saturday, May 31, 2003
May 30, 2003: SB1912 - Third Reading - Friday, May 30, 2003
March 27, 2003: SB1912 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 27, 2003
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor