+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Health
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed- Subcommittee on Children & Family
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Children & Family
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 210 ILCS 135/3 - from Ch. 91 1/2, par. 1703
- 225 ILCS 10/2.16 - from Ch. 23, par. 2212.16
- 225 ILCS 10/3.5 rep. -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor