+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2011
On March 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- To Public Health Subcommittee on Special Issues
On March 2, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Matt Murphy
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor