+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0066
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-001
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Environment & Energy; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment & Energy
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 27, 2005.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment & Energy Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Environment & Energy Committee
- Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
- Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2005
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dan Reitz
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-001-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2005
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment & Energy; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2005
- Do Pass Environment & Energy; 009-000-000
- Postponed - Environment & Energy
- Assigned to Environment & Energy
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that the more stringent regulations of coal combustion by-product (CCB) provided under this Section do not apply to CCB used for mine subsidence, mine fire control, mine sealing, and mine reclamation (previously this use was included in the class of CCB uses subject to the stricter regulations). Eliminates boron, chloride, sulfate, and phenol from a list of Class I groundwater parameters that certain CCB uses may not exceed.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that the more stringent regulations of coal combustion by-product (CCB) provided under this Section do not apply to CCB used for mine subsidence, mine fire control, mine sealing, and mine reclamation (previously this use was included in the class of CCB uses subject to the stricter regulations). Eliminates boron, chloride, sulfate, and phenol from a list of Class I groundwater parameters that certain CCB uses may not exceed.
+ − Statute Amended
- 415 ILCS 5/3.135 - was 415 ILCS 5/3.94