+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
On August 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0423
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 20, 2015
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2015
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-001-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 049-001-000
- Senate Concurs 049-001-000
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Rita Mayfield
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-001-000
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 24, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 011-000-000
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Revenue
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to create tax checkoffs for Special Olympics, the U.S.S. Illinois Commissioning Fund, and the Autism Care Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Property Tax Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the senior citizens assessment freeze homestead exemption.
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the provisions of the introduced bill apply beginning with the 2015 tax year (instead of 2016).
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (8)
May 31, 2015: SB1906 - Third Reading - Sunday, May 31, 2015
May 31, 2015: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Sunday, May 31, 2015
May 31, 2015: HFA0002 - Concurrence - Sunday, May 31, 2015
May 30, 2015: HFA0002 - Revenue & Finance - May 30, 2015
May 30, 2015: SB1906 - Revenue & Finance - May 30, 2015
April 22, 2015: SB1906 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 22, 2015
March 18, 2015: SB1906 - Revenue - Mar 18, 2015
March 18, 2015: SCA0001 - Revenue - Mar 18, 2015
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor