+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Executive- Elections
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 10 ILCS 5/9-7 - from Ch. 46, par. 9-7
- 10 ILCS 5/9-13 - from Ch. 46, par. 9-13