+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (47)
- Session Sine Die
- Moved to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William Black
- Motion Discharge Committee Lost
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Recede Rep. Angelo Saviano
- Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Senate Non-Concurs 01
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Non-Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01-May 29, 2008
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 01
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2008
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 23, 2008
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Added as Co-Sponsor, Senator Haine
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; DeLeo and Haine
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-004
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 010-000-000
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William E. Peterson
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Public Health
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 2, 2008
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 1, 2008
- Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 008-000-002
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Assigned to Public Health
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Provides that a treatment provider for autism spectrum disorders shall furnish medical records upon request of the reimbursing insurer. Provides that the insurer may request a treatment plan when treatment is anticipated to require continued services to achieve demonstrable progress. Provides that an insurer must make the determination of medical necessity in a manner that is consistent with the manner used to make that determination with respect to other diseases or illnesses covered under the policy. Provides that coverage for medically necessary early intervention services must be delivered by certified early intervention specialists. Provides that a diagnosis of autism spectrum disorders may be diagnosis by a licensed clinical psychologist (instead of a certified, registered, or licensed health care professional). Makes technical changes. Makes other changes.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the bill as introduced with the following changes: (i) in provisions amending the Insurance Code, provides that benefits available to an individual for treatment for an autism spectrum disorder under a policy of accident and health insurance or managed care plan may not be subject to dollar limits, deductibles, copayments, or coinsurance provisions that are less favorable to the insured than the dollar limits, deductibles, or coinsurance provisions that apply to physical illness generally; provides that an insurer may not deny or refuse to provide otherwise covered services, or refuse to renew, refuse to reissue, or otherwise terminate or restrict coverage under an individual contract to provide services to an individual because the individual or their dependent is diagnosed with an autism spectrum disorder or due to the individual utilizing benefits for autism spectrum disorder; and makes changes in definitions and (ii) removes provisions amending the Limited Health Service Organization Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 2
Provides that a treatment provider for autism spectrum disorders shall furnish medical records upon request of the reimbursing insurer. Provides that the insurer may request a treatment plan when treatment is anticipated to require continued services to achieve demonstrable progress. Provides that an insurer must make the determination of medical necessity in a manner that is consistent with the manner used to make that determination with respect to other diseases or illnesses covered under the policy. Provides that coverage for medically necessary early intervention services must be delivered by certified early intervention specialists. Provides that a diagnosis of autism spectrum disorders may be diagnosis by a licensed clinical psychologist (instead of a certified, registered, or licensed health care professional). Makes technical changes. Makes other changes.
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 5 ILCS 375/6.11 -
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069.3 -
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2.3 -
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.3f -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.11 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2
- 215 ILCS 130/4003 - from Ch. 73, par. 1504-3
- 215 ILCS 165/10 - from Ch. 32, par. 604
- 305 ILCS 5/5-16.8 -