+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0083
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 015-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill with the following changes. Adds the Illinois Community College Board as a governing body with responsibilities under the Act. Requires an institution to create a position to carry out the responsibilities of a liaison if the number of students experiencing homelessness or students in care exceeds 2% (rather than 1%) of the student body. Effective August 1, 2022.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2021: SB0190 - Third Reading
May 5, 2021: SB0190 - Higher Education
April 21, 2021: SB0190 - Third Reading
March 23, 2021: SB0190 - Higher Education
March 23, 2021: SCA0001 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor