+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0240
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2018
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
- Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- To Commercial Law Subcommittee
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
- First Reading
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2017
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-001-001
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steve Stadelman