+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 94-0582
- Effective Date January 1, 2006
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2005 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2005 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On May 24, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 20, 2005 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2005
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 010-000-000
On April 27, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On April 26, 2005 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John A. Fritchey
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Silverstein
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 14, 2005
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 12, 2005
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2005
On March 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause Reinserts the provisions of the original bill with the following changes. Provides for a 90-day extension of the time limit for discovery for the withdrawal of plaintiff's counsel or for good cause.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause Reinserts the provisions of the original bill with the following changes. Provides for a 90-day extension of the time limit for discovery for the withdrawal of plaintiff's counsel or for good cause.
+ − Statute Amended
- 735 ILCS 5/2-402 - from Ch. 110, par. 2-402