+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0018
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 20, 2019; ; some provisions effective 1-1-20
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3 - May 28, 2019
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 3
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Rep. Justin Slaughter
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as amended by House Amendment No. 1.Creates the Lodging Establishment Human Trafficking Recognition Training Act. Requires hotels and motels to train employees in the recognition of human trafficking and protocols for reporting observed human trafficking to the appropriate authority. Provides that the Department of Labor shall develop the curriculum for the training. Provides that beginning June 1, 2020, a lodging establishment shall provide its employees with training in the recognition of human trafficking and protocols for reporting observed human trafficking to the appropriate authority. Provides that the Department shall develop and publish the human trafficking recognition training program by July 1, 2020. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Director of State Police shall conduct or approve a training program in the detection and investigation of all forms of human trafficking, including, but not limited to "involuntary servitude", "involuntary sexual servitude of a minor", and "trafficking in persons" and that the program shall be made available to all cadets and state police officers. In the amendatory changes to the Illinois Police Training Act, provides that the curriculum of police training schools shall include training in the detection and investigation of all forms of human trafficking. In the amendatory changes to the Criminal Code of 2012, provides that a company is criminally liable for trafficking in persons when the company knowingly benefits, financially or by receiving anything of value, from participation in a venture that has engaged in an act of involuntary servitude or involuntary sexual servitude of a minor. Makes other changes. Some provisions effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that all law enforcement officers must take human trafficking training. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that when the victim is 18 years of age or over at the time of the offense, a prosecution for involuntary servitude, involuntary sexual servitude of a minor, or trafficking in persons and related offenses may be commenced within 25 years (rather than 3 years) after the commission of the offense. Provides that a company commits trafficking in persons when the company benefits, financially or by receiving anything of value, from participation in a venture that has engaged in an act of involuntary servitude or involuntary sexual servitude of a minor. Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that an action under the Trafficking Victims Protection Act must be commenced within 25 (rather than 10) years of the date the limitation period begins to run or within 25 (rather than 10) years of the date the plaintiff discovers or through the use of reasonable diligence should discover both (1) that the sex trade, involuntary servitude, or human trafficking act occurred, and (2) that the defendant caused, was responsible for, or profited from the sex trade, involuntary servitude, or human trafficking act. Makes other changes.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 725 ILCS 5/106D-1 -
- 50 ILCS 705/10.23 new -
- 720 ILCS 5/3-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 3-6
- 720 ILCS 5/10-9 -
- 735 ILCS 5/13-225 -
- New Act -
- 20 ILCS 2605/2605-99 new -
- 50 ILCS 705/7 - from Ch. 85, par. 507