+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0185
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2014
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 007-000-000
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- First Reading
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 008-000-000
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 210 ILCS 25/2-127.5 -
- 210 ILCS 25/7-101 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 627-101
- 210 ILCS 25/7-102 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 627-102