+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Labor and Commerce
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Labor and Commerce
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Labor and Commerce
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Muñoz
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Labor and Commerce
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 20 ILCS 2610/7.3 new -
- 20 ILCS 415/4c - from Ch. 127, par. 63b104c
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor