+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2009
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 To Energy Subcommittee on Readiness
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2009
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy
On March 17, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
On March 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009
- Do Pass Executive; 007-002-002
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 220 ILCS 5/1-101 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 1-101
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor