+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On August 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 1, 2009
- Second Reading
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2009
- Do Pass Education; 009-000-000
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On February 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1106 - from Ch. 34, par. 5-1106
- 30 ILCS 805/8.33 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor