+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 5/115-10 - from Ch. 38, par. 115-10
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor