+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On August 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0292
- Effective Date January 1, 2014
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 9, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 10, 2013
- Do Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 008-000-000
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Connelly
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Adds a cross reference to a Section of the Code that requires a police officer to request a blood draw if he or she suspects that a motor vehicle driven by or in actual physical control of a person under the influence of alcohol, other drug or drugs, or intoxicating compound or compounds, or any combination thereof has caused the death or personal injury to another. Allows reimbursement whether the blood draw takes place at a law enforcement facility or a health care facility.