+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On January 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On May 11, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 13, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-001-000
On March 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2005
- Second Reading
On March 10, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2005
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
On March 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 25, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.11b - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.11b