+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0322
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 30, 2015
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Daniel Biss
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Biss
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000
- Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Changes membership on the Silver Search Task Force. Deletes references to representatives of specific private organizations and replaces with generic references to groups that support their causes. Provides that the Department of State Police shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of State Police, in cooperation with the Silver Search Task Force, shall develop as part of the Endangered Missing Person Advisory a coordinated statewide awareness program and toolkit to be used when a person 21 years of age or older who is believed to have Alzheimer's disease, other related dementia, or other dementia-like cognitive impairment is reported missing, which shall be referred to as Silver Search. Provides that the Department of State Police shall establish a Silver Search Task Force within 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act to assist the Department in development and deployment of the Silver Search Awareness Program and toolkit. Provides that the Task Force shall establish the criteria and create a toolkit, which may include usage of Department of Transportation signs. Provides that the Task Force shall monitor and review the implementation and operation of that program, including procedures, budgetary requirements, standards, and minimum requirements for the training of law enforcement personnel on how to interact appropriately and effectively with individuals that suffer from Alzheimer's disease, other dementia, or other dementia-like cognitive impairment. Provides that the Task Force shall also develop additional network and financial resources for use in the system. Provides that the Task Force shall meet at least twice a year and shall provide a report on the operations of the Silver Search Program to the General Assembly and the Governor each year by June 30. Provides that the Department of State Police, in coordination with the Department on Aging and the Silver Search Task Force, shall develop and implement a community outreach program to promote awareness of the Silver Search Program as part of the Endangered Missing Person Advisory among law enforcement agencies, the State's healthcare facilities, nursing homes, assisted living facilities, other senior centers, and the general population on or before January 1, 2017. Provides that the Department of State Police shall designate an individual to serve as the Silver Search Program Coordinator within 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall coordinate with the Department of State Police in the use of electronic message signs on roads and highways to immediately provide critical information to the public concerning missing persons with Alzheimer's disease, other related dementia, or other dementia-like cognitive impairment, as allowed by federal guidelines. Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board shall conduct a training program for law enforcement personnel of local governmental agencies in the statewide Alzheimer's disease, other related dementia, or other dementia-like cognitive impairment coordinated Silver Search Awareness Program and toolkit. Provides that the Board shall adopt written protocols and guidelines for the handling of missing persons cases involving Alzheimer's disease, other related dementia, or other dementia-like cognitive impairment based upon protocols developed by the Silver Search Task Force in conjunction with the Department of State Police on or before July 1, 2016.