+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (60)
- Bill Dead - Amendatory Veto
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto
- Governor Amendatory Veto
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs 034-016-001
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 034-016-001
- Verified
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Daniel Biss
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 29, 2015
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-052-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 007-004-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-003-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Will Guzzardi
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 035-013-004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Biss
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Judiciary
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
- Sponsor Removed Sen. William Delgado
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015
- Do Pass Judiciary; 012-000-000
- Postponed - Judiciary
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 002
Provides that the entities subject to the federal Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act of 1996 that comply with that Act shall be deemed to be incompliance with the Personal Information Protection Act upon making certain disclosures to the Attorney General. Provides that "consumer marketing information" does not include certain search histories, browsing histories, or purchase histories. Requires State agencies to provide notice of data breaches to the Attorney General. Authorizes the Attorney General to publish names of data collectors and dates of breaches.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with provisions similar to the introduced bill. Removes geolocation information and consumer marketing information from the scope of the bill. Reduces the scope of the notice required with respect to breaches of certain personal information. Raises the threshold for notice to the Attorney General of breaches to breaches affecting 250, rather than 100, Illinois residents. Provides that data collectors that comply with certain federal requirements shall be deemed to be incompliance with the Personal Information Protection Act. Provides for notice to the Attorney General within 30, rather than 14, business days