+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Laura Ellman
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Higher Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2021
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Higher Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Higher Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Higher Education
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021
- Do Pass Higher Education; 013-001-000
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2021: SFA0001 - Higher Education
April 13, 2021: SB1832 - Higher Education
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor