+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 13, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0366
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000
On May 14, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On May 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 12, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
On May 5, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Loughran Cappel
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Education; 014-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Courses of Study Article of the School Code. Provides that of the 2 years of social studies required to receive a high school diploma, one semester, or part of one semester, may include a financial literacy course beginning with pupils entering the 9th grade in the 2021-2022 school year and each school year thereafter. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/27-22 - from Ch. 122, par. 27-22
+ − Votes (5)
May 21, 2021: SB1830 - Third Reading
May 5, 2021: SB1830 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
April 21, 2021: SB1830 - Third Reading
April 13, 2021: SFA0001 - Education
March 16, 2021: SB1830 - Education
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor