+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On November 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1119
- Effective Date January 1, 2019
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Both Houses Override Total Veto
On November 27, 2018 in the House:
- Override Governor Veto - House Passed 080-031-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 14, 2018 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Arthur Turner
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto
- Arrived in House
On November 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 054-001-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On November 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Michael E. Hastings
- Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018
On July 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 074-033-000
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On July 6, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
On June 26, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
- Arrived in House
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Hastings
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (7)
November 27, 2018: SB1830 - Motion
November 14, 2018: SB1830 - Motion
April 24, 2018: SB1830 - Third Reading
May 25, 2017: SB1830 - Judiciary - Criminal
May 5, 2017: SB1830 - Third Reading
March 14, 2017: SFA0001 - Criminal Law
March 7, 2017: SB1830 - Criminal Law
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor