+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/24A-5 - from Ch. 122, par. 24A-5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor