+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0377
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 17, 2015
On June 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Higher Education; 011-000-000
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Higher Education
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 29, 2015
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015
On May 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 15, 2015
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2015
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2015
- Do Pass Higher Education; 011-000-000
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the contents of the bill, but removes the amendatory language that provides that if a scholarship is not awarded for a given period of hostilities because there are no qualified applicants, then the county may award the scholarship for another one of the listed periods of hostilities, in which case there may be more than one scholarship awarded for the same period of hostilities. Effective July 1, 2015.
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 305/9 - from Ch. 144, par. 30
+ − Votes (6)
May 31, 2015: HCA0001 - Concurrence - Sunday, May 31, 2015
May 30, 2015: HCA0001 - Higher Education - May 30, 2015
May 28, 2015: SB1818 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 28, 2015
May 19, 2015: SB1818 - Higher Education - May 19, 2015
April 30, 2015: SB1818 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 30, 2015
March 24, 2015: SB1818 - Higher Education - Mar 24, 2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor