+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 18, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On March 3, 2011 in the Senate:
- To Executive Subcommittee on Election Law; /3-14-2011 - Postponed
On February 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 10 ILCS 5/7-41 - from Ch. 46, par. 7-41
- 10 ILCS 5/17-29 - from Ch. 46, par. 17-29
- 10 ILCS 5/19-2.2 - from Ch. 46, par. 19-2.2
- 10 ILCS 5/19A-70 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor