+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Special Issues (ED)
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/3-15.12 - from Ch. 122, par. 3-15.12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor