+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Insurance Mandates and Special Issues
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Insurance
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- 5 ILCS 375/6.11 -
- 55 ILCS 5/5-1069.3 -
- 65 ILCS 5/10-4-2.3 -
- 105 ILCS 5/10-22.3f -
- 215 ILCS 5/356z.23 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/5-3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1411.2
- 215 ILCS 130/4003 - from Ch. 73, par. 1504-3
- 215 ILCS 165/10 - from Ch. 32, par. 604
- 305 ILCS 5/5-16.8 -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor