+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0897
- Effective Date May 24, 2022
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 051-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Robert Peters
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - April 6, 2022
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 23, 2022
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2022
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 012-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As February 18, 2022
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Further amends the Legislative Accessibility Act. Provides that the Illinois General Assembly website shall include an email address, web form, or other similar mechanism to meet the accessibility needs of persons attending legislative meetings, hearings, floor proceedings, and press conferences at the Capitol Complex (rather than persons attending legislative events, including, but not limited to, all hearings and floor proceedings). Makes a technical change.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Removes provision requiring the General Assembly Accessibility Task Force to be convened by the Department of Central Management Services in coordination with the Secretary of State. Modifies the appointment of members to the Task Force. Provides that the President of the Senate, Speaker of the House of Representatives, Minority Leader of the Senate, and Minority Leader of the House of Representatives shall each appoint 2 members to the Task Force (rather than the Governor appointing 15 members). Provides for the appointment of the Task Force chair. Provides that appointees shall include persons who self-identify as having a disability or advocates for such persons. Provides for specified State officials to serve on the Task Force as ex officio members. Provides that the Architect of the Capitol (rather than the Department of Central Management Services) shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Requires the Task Force to issue its recommendations to the General Assembly no later than December 31, 2023 (rather than December 31, 2021). Repeals the Task Force on January 1, 2025 (rather than January 1, 2023). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -