+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On August 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0452
- Effective Date August 7, 2003
- Governor Approved
On June 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 22, 2003 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 22, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 118-000-000
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b); May 23, 2003
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 16, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Dale A. Righter
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On March 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2003
- Second Reading
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 11, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 013-000-000
On February 27, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. George P. Shadid
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Lauzen
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Vince Demuzio