+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
- Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (10)
- 5 ILCS 100/5-45 - from Ch. 127, par. 1005-45
- 20 ILCS 655/5.5 - from Ch. 67 1/2, par. 609.1
- 20 ILCS 3855/1-10 -
- 20 ILCS 3855/1-56 -
- 20 ILCS 3855/1-75 -
- 220 ILCS 5/16-107.5 -
- 220 ILCS 5/16-107.6 -
- 220 ILCS 5/16-107.7 new -
- 220 ILCS 5/16-108 -
- 220 ILCS 5/16-111.5 -
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor