+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On March 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 8, 2007
- Do Pass Judiciary Criminal Law; 009-000-000
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary Criminal Law
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/6-206 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-206
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor