+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
- Second Reading
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2021
- Do Pass Transportation; 019-000-000
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
April 20, 2021: SB1768 - Transportation
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor