+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Transportation
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Appropriations- Government Infrastructure
- Assigned to Transportation
- Directed to Multiple Committees Transportation Committee, Appropriations- Government Infrastructure Subcommittee
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Donald P. DeWitte
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 620 ILCS 5/34 - from Ch. 15 1/2, par. 22.34
- 620 ILCS 5/38.01 - from Ch. 15 1/2, par. 22.38a