+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
On August 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0460
- Effective Date January 1, 2018
- Governor Approved
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 31, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
- Arrived in House
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Biss
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 041-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-002-002
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Daniel Biss
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 720 ILCS 5/9-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 9-1
- 720 ILCS 5/9-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 9-2
+ − Votes (5)
May 31, 2017: SB1761 - Third Reading
May 25, 2017: SB1761 - Judiciary - Criminal
May 5, 2017: SB1761 - Third Reading
May 2, 2017: SFA0002 - Criminal Law
March 7, 2017: SB1761 - Criminal Law
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor