+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Executive- Firearms
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 430 ILCS 65/2 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-2
- 430 ILCS 65/3 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-3
- 430 ILCS 65/6.2 new -
- 430 ILCS 66/11 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor