+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On August 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0532
- Effective Date August 28, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Charles E. Jefferson
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 25, 2007
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On May 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrived in House
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 30, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Sandoval
- Second Reading
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000
On March 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services
On March 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
On March 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 15, 2007
- Do Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the Senate:
- Held in Human Services
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On January 31, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with provisions substantially similar to those of Senate Bill 175, amending the Energy Assistance Act, except omits amendatory provisions concerning preparation of applications for energy assistance by Case Coordination Units and a web-based application for assistance. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 20/4 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 1404
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2007: SB0175 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 31, 2007
May 10, 2007: SB0175 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 10, 2007
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor