+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013
- Second Reading
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 20, 2013
- Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 012-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Restores current law with respect to the exception for contracts for materials and work that have been awarded to the lowest responsible bidder but must be revised, causing expenditures not in excess of 10% of the contract price.
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 805/3-27.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-27.1
+ − Vote
April 10, 2013: SB1746 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 10, 2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor