+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0351
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Christopher Belt
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
- Arrived in House
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-002
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
- Second Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
- Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2019
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Provides that the application must include the eligible person's address associated with his or her residence upon release from the facility. Provides that if the residence is temporary, the eligible person must notify the Department of Human Services of his or her change in address upon transition to permanent housing.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with changes. Provides that officials of the correctional institution or facility where the committed person is assigned shall assist an eligible person to complete a Medicaid application to ensure that the person begins receiving benefits as soon as possible (rather than immediately) after his or her release.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-14-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-14-1
+ − Votes (7)
May 31, 2019: HCA0001 - Concurrence
May 28, 2019: HCA0001 - Human Services
May 23, 2019: SB1744 - Third Reading
May 9, 2019: SB1744 - Appropriations-Human Services
March 20, 2019: SB1744 - Third Reading
March 12, 2019: SB1744 - Human Services
March 12, 2019: SCA0001 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor