+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On January 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On December 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 5, 2021
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021
- Second Reading
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021
- Do Pass as Amended Executive; 014-000-000
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Extends the sale of the special instant scratch-off game to benefit Alzheimer's care, support, education, and awareness to January 1, 2025 (rather than January 1, 2022). Effective immediately.