+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 5, 2017
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Executive
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Executive
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Local Government
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 70 ILCS 915/2 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 5002
- 70 ILCS 915/8 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 5018
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor