+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 12, 2011 in the Senate:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- To Public Health Subcommittee on Special Issues
On March 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On February 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor