+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On July 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0223
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 20, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-043-001
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 005-003-000
On April 28, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-018-000
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Commerce; 007-004-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Commerce
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 20, 2021: SB1730 - Third Reading
May 6, 2021: SB1730 - Health Care Licenses
April 21, 2021: SB1730 - Third Reading
April 15, 2021: SB1730 - Commerce
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor