+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0562
- Effective Date August 23, 2019
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Concurs
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Environment and Conservation
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019
- Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-008-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee
- Assigned to Public Utilities Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harris
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2019
- Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-000-000
- Assigned to Environment and Conservation
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Changes the person who appoints certain members of the advisory committee to the Director of the Government Finance Research Center (rather than the Director of Public Health). Requires the Government Finance Research Center (rather than the Department of Public Health) to provide administrative and other support to the committee. Requires the Government Finance Research Center (rather than the Department of Public Health) to provide an opportunity for public comment on the questions to be addressed in the water rates report, the metrics to be used, and the recommendations that need to be issued. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the University of Illinois Act. Provides that, subject to appropriation, no later than December 1, 2020, the Government Finance Research Center at the University of Illinois at Chicago, in coordination with an intergovernmental advisory committee, must issue a report evaluating the setting of water rates throughout the Lake Michigan service area of northeastern Illinois and, no later than December 1, 2021, for the remainder of Illinois; specifies report requirements. Provides that in developing the report, the Government Finance Research Center shall form an advisory committee; provides for the committee's membership. Provides that no later than 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the Department of Public Health must provide an opportunity for public comment on the questions to be addressed in the report, the metrics to be used, and the recommendations that need to be issued. Repeals the provision on January 1, 2022. Effective immediately.