+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0542
- Effective Date November 8, 2017
On November 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Both Houses Override Total Veto
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Override Governor Veto - House Passed 109-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Arthur Turner
On November 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 052-000-000
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto
On October 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed Calendar Total Veto
On August 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 26, 2017 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
On May 25, 2017 in the House:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Arthur Turner
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 012-000-000
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
- Second Reading
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2017
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (6)
November 8, 2017: SB1714 - Motion
November 7, 2017: SB1714 - Motion
May 30, 2017: SB1714 - Third Reading
May 23, 2017: SB1714 - Personnel & Pensions
April 27, 2017: SB1714 - Third Reading
March 8, 2017: SB1714 - Licensed Activities and Pensions
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor